PA SB385 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-09 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-09 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.343, No.176), known as The Fiscal Code, in emergency COVID-19 response, providing for a long-term care facility ventilation grant program.
Title
In emergency COVID-19 response, providing for a long-term care facility ventilation grant program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Aging And Youth: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-06-08 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to AGING AND YOUTH |