PA SB367 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on October 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-08 - Act No. 147
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on October 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-08 - Act No. 147
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act providing for indigenous mineral resource development; and imposing powers and duties on the Department of General Services and the State System of Higher Education.
Title
Providing for indigenous mineral resource development; and imposing powers and duties on the Department of General Services and the State System of Higher Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-09-25 - House - SB 367 PN 2349, CONCUR (Y: 136 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-30 - Senate - SB 367 PN 2349, CONCURRENCE IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS AS AMENDED (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-29 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - House - SB 367 PN 2327, FP (Y: 131 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - House - SB 367 PN 2209, 2011 A11398, FRANKEL (Y: 92 N: 103 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2012-06-25 - House - SB 367 PN 2209, 2011 A11439, GEORGE (Y: 118 N: 78 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - House - SB 367 PN 2209, 2011 A12168, VITALI (Y: 50 N: 147 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2012-06-25 - House - SB 367 PN 2209, 2011 A12007, VITALI (Y: 80 N: 117 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2012-06-25 - House - SB 367 PN 2209, 2011 A12185, VITALI (Y: 74 N: 124 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-06-25 - House - SB 367 PN 2209, 2011 A11151, VITALI (Y: 68 N: 130 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-06-25 - House - SB 367 PN 2209, 2011 A12005, VITALI (Y: 60 N: 138 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-06-25 - House - SB 367 PN 2209, 2011 A11738, VITALI (Y: 64 N: 134 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-06-25 - House - SB 367 PN 2209, 2011 A11349, VITALI (Y: 62 N: 136 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-06-25 - House - SB 367 PN 2209, 2011 A11162, SANTARSIERO (Y: 69 N: 129 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-06-25 - House - SB 367 PN 2209, 2011 A12193, BAKER (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - House - SB 367 PN 2209, 2011 A11107, BAKER (Y: 94 N: 104 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2011-10-26 - Senate - SB 367 PN 1718, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-26 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-30 - Senate - SB 367 PN 2349, CONCURRENCE IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS AS AMENDED (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-29 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - House - SB 367 PN 2327, FP (Y: 131 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - House - SB 367 PN 2209, 2011 A11398, FRANKEL (Y: 92 N: 103 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2012-06-25 - House - SB 367 PN 2209, 2011 A11439, GEORGE (Y: 118 N: 78 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - House - SB 367 PN 2209, 2011 A12168, VITALI (Y: 50 N: 147 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2012-06-25 - House - SB 367 PN 2209, 2011 A12007, VITALI (Y: 80 N: 117 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2012-06-25 - House - SB 367 PN 2209, 2011 A12185, VITALI (Y: 74 N: 124 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-06-25 - House - SB 367 PN 2209, 2011 A11151, VITALI (Y: 68 N: 130 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-06-25 - House - SB 367 PN 2209, 2011 A12005, VITALI (Y: 60 N: 138 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-06-25 - House - SB 367 PN 2209, 2011 A11738, VITALI (Y: 64 N: 134 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-06-25 - House - SB 367 PN 2209, 2011 A11349, VITALI (Y: 62 N: 136 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-06-25 - House - SB 367 PN 2209, 2011 A11162, SANTARSIERO (Y: 69 N: 129 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-06-25 - House - SB 367 PN 2209, 2011 A12193, BAKER (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - House - SB 367 PN 2209, 2011 A11107, BAKER (Y: 94 N: 104 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2011-10-26 - Senate - SB 367 PN 1718, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-26 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-08 | House | Act No. 147 |
2012-10-08 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2012-10-01 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2012-10-01 | House | Signed in House |
2012-09-25 | House | Signed in Senate |
2012-09-25 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments to House amendments (136-62) |
2012-06-30 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2012-06-30 | House | Referred to RULES |
2012-06-30 | House | In the House |
2012-06-30 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments, as amended by the Senate (46-3) |
2012-06-29 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as amended |
2012-06-27 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2012-06-26 | Senate | In the Senate |
2012-06-26 | House | Third consideration and final passage (131-68) |
2012-06-26 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2012-06-25 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2012-06-25 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2012-06-05 | House | Removed from table |
2012-05-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2012-05-23 | House | First consideration |
2012-05-23 | House | Reported as amended |
2011-10-31 | House | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |
2011-10-26 | House | In the House |
2011-10-26 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (47-2) |
2011-10-25 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2011-10-17 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2011-09-27 | Senate | Second consideration |
2011-09-26 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2011-05-24 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-05-03 | Senate | First consideration |
2011-05-03 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2011-02-01 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |