PA SB366 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on August 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-27 - Act No. 39
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on August 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-27 - Act No. 39
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for right to bail.
Title
Further providing for right to bail.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Alloway [R] | Sen. Lisa Boscola [D] | Sen. Patrick Browne [R] | Sen. Jay Costa [D] |
Sen. Jane Earll [R] | Sen. Stewart Greenleaf [R] | Sen. Kim Ward [R] | Sen. Leanna Washington [D] |
Sen. Mary White [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-08-19 - House - SB 366 PN 365, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-23 - Senate - SB 366 PN 365, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-23 - Senate - SB 366 PN 365, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-27 | Act No. 39 | |
2009-08-27 | Approved by the Governor | |
2009-08-20 | Presented to the Governor | |
2009-08-20 | Signed in House | |
2009-08-19 | Signed in Senate | |
2009-08-19 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-08-17 | Removed from table | |
2009-08-17 | Laid on the table | |
2009-08-04 | Second consideration | |
2009-08-04 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-07-13 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-07-13 | Removed from table | |
2009-07-08 | Laid on the table | |
2009-07-08 | First consideration | |
2009-07-08 | Reported as committed | |
2009-03-24 | Referred to JUDICIARY | |
2009-03-23 | In the House | |
2009-03-23 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-03-16 | Second consideration | |
2009-03-10 | First consideration | |
2009-03-10 | Reported as committed | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to JUDICIARY |