PA SB360 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-07 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-07 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 12, 1951 (P.L.90, No.21), known as the Liquor Code, in licenses and regulations and liquor, alcohol and malt and brewed beverages, further providing for authority to issue liquor licenses to hotels, restaurants and clubs, for sales by liquor licensees and restrictions, for sale of malt or brewed beverages by liquor licensees, for retail dispensers' restrictions on purchases and sales, for unlawful acts relative to malt or brewed beverages and licensees and for premises to be vacated by patrons.
Title
In licenses and regulations and liquor, alcohol and malt and brewed beverages, further providing for authority to issue liquor licenses to hotels, restaurants and clubs, for sales by liquor licensees and restrictions, for sale of malt or brewed beverages by liquor licensees, for retail dispensers' restrictions on purchases and sales, for unlawful acts relative to malt or brewed beverages and licensees and for premises to be vacated by patrons.
Sponsors
Sen. Judith Ward [R] | Sen. Kristin Phillips-Hill [R] | Sen. Gene Yaw [R] | Sen. Michael Regan [R] |
Sen. Patrick Stefano [R] | Sen. Ryan Aument [R] | Sen. Camera Bartolotta [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Law And Justice: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-07 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2023-04-25 | Senate | First consideration |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE |