PA SB344 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 28 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-10-04 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 28 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-10-04 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 20, 1967 (P.L.869, No.385), known as the Public Works Contractors' Bond Law of 1967, further providing for duty of prime contractor to provide financial security in certain contracts involving public works and public improvements.
Title
Further providing for duty of prime contractor to provide financial security in certain contracts involving public works and public improvements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-09-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 344 PN 478, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-28 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-28 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-28 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-28 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-04 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2016-09-28 | House | In the House |
2016-09-28 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2016-09-27 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-09-26 | Senate | Removed from table |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2015-11-17 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-10-28 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-10-28 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |