PA SB297 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-29 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-29 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 53 (Municipalities Generally) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in consolidated county assessment, further providing for appeals by taxing districts and providing for standards of redress in appeals.
Title
In consolidated county assessment, further providing for appeals by taxing districts and providing for standards of redress in appeals.
Sponsors
Sen. David Argall [R] | Sen. Kim Ward [R] | Sen. Giovanni DiSanto [R] | Sen. Michael Regan [R] |
Sen. Patrick Stefano [R] | Sen. Cris Dush [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate Urban Affairs And Housing: Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-29 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Removed from table |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2022-03-30 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING |