PA SB248 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Passed on November 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-17 - Act No. 87 of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Passed on November 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-17 - Act No. 87 of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 38 (Holidays and Observances) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for holidays and observances.
Title
Providing for holidays and observances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-10 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 248 PN 1222, Concur in House Amendments (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-11-10 - House - House Floor: SB 248 PN 1222, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-11-09 - House - House Floor: SB 248 PN 1128, 2021 A2550 (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-06 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-06 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A02510 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 248 PN 216, Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 248 PN 1222, Concur in House Amendments (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-11-10 - House - House Floor: SB 248 PN 1222, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-11-09 - House - House Floor: SB 248 PN 1128, 2021 A2550 (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-06 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-06 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A02510 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 248 PN 216, Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-17 | Senate | Act No. 87 of 2021 |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2021-11-10 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2021-11-10 | Senate | Signed in House |
2021-11-10 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2021-11-10 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (49-0) |
2021-11-10 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2021-11-10 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2021-11-10 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-11-10 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2021-11-10 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-11-09 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-11-09 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2021-11-08 | House | Removed from table |
2021-10-06 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-10-06 | House | First consideration |
2021-10-06 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-04-21 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2021-04-20 | House | In the House |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (47-0) |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-03-23 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |