PA SB237 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Passed on March 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-22 - Act No. 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Passed on March 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-22 - Act No. 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 17, 1921 (P.L.682, No.284), known as The Insurance Company Law of 1921, in general provisions relating to insurance companies, further providing for annual and other reports; providing for suitability of annuity transactions and for the regulation of health insurance practices concerning parity and nondiscrimination; further providing for definitions, for acting for or aiding nonadmitted insurers, for requirements for eligible surplus lines insurers, for other nonadmitted insurers, for surplus lines licensee's duty to notify insured, for declarations, for surplus lines advisory organizations, for evidence of insurance, for effect of payment to surplus lines licensee, for licensing of surplus lines licensee, for surplus lines licensee's acceptance of business from brokers, for records of surplus lines licensees, for monthly reports, for surplus lines tax, for tax on independently procured insurance, for suspension, revocation or nonrenewal of surplus lines licensee's license and for penalties; providing for compliance; and, in children's health care, further providing for expiration of certain provisions.
Title
In general provisions relating to insurance companies, further providing for annual and other reports; providing for suitability of annuity transactions and for the regulation of health insurance practices concerning parity and nondiscrimination; further providing for definitions, for acting for or aiding nonadmitted insurers, for requirements for eligible surplus lines insurers, for other nonadmitted insurers, for surplus lines licensee's duty to notify insured, for declarations, for surplus lines advisory organizations, for evidence of insurance, for effect of payment to surplus lines licensee, for licensing of surplus lines licensee, for surplus lines licensee's acceptance of business from brokers, for records of surplus lines licensees, for monthly reports, for surplus lines tax, for tax on independently procured insurance, for suspension, revocation or nonrenewal of surplus lines licensee's license and for penalties; providing for compliance; and, in children's health care, further providing for expiration of certain provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-16 - Senate - SB 237 PN 1688, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - House - SB 237 PN 1688, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - House - SB 237 PN 747, 2009 A5701, BARBIN (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-20 - Senate - SB 237 PN 747, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - House - SB 237 PN 1688, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - House - SB 237 PN 747, 2009 A5701, BARBIN (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-20 - Senate - SB 237 PN 747, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-22 | Act No. 14 | |
2010-03-22 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-03-17 | Presented to the Governor | |
2010-03-17 | Signed in House | |
2010-03-16 | Signed in Senate | |
2010-03-16 | Senate concurred in House amendments | |
2010-03-15 | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed | |
2010-03-09 | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS | |
2010-03-08 | In the Senate | |
2010-03-08 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-02-08 | Second consideration, with amendments | |
2010-02-08 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-08-06 | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-08-06 | Removed from table | |
2009-08-05 | Laid on the table | |
2009-08-05 | First consideration | |
2009-08-05 | Reported as committed | |
2009-04-22 | Referred to INSURANCE | |
2009-04-20 | In the House | |
2009-04-20 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-03-25 | Second consideration | |
2009-03-23 | Re-reported as amended | |
2009-03-18 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-03-10 | First consideration | |
2009-03-10 | Reported as amended | |
2009-02-19 | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |