PA SB223 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-19 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: House Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-19 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: House Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of September 27, 1961 (P.L.1700, No.699), known as the Pharmacy Act, further providing for definitions and for unlawful acts.
Title
Further providing for definitions and for unlawful acts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 223 PN 1018, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-19 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2019-06-19 | House | In the House |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-06-04 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |