PA SB219 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-11 - Act No. 53 of 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-11 - Act No. 53 of 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 13, 1988 (P.L.1190, No.146), known as the First and Second Class County Property Tax Relief Act, further providing for short title, for definitions, for deferral or exemption authority and for retroactive application.
Title
Further providing for short title, for definitions, for deferral or exemption authority and for retroactive application.
Sponsors
Sen. Jay Costa [D] | Sen. James Brewster [D] | Sen. Christine Tartaglione [D] | Sen. Timothy Kearney [D] |
Sen. Nikil Saval [D] | Sen. Sharif Street [D] | Sen. Lindsey Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-07-10 - House - House Floor: SB 219 PN 188, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 102 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-07-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-09 - House - House Floor: SB 219 PN 188, MOTION TO TABLE AMENDMENTS (Y: 102 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-07-08 - House - House Finance: Motion that amendment A05442 not Germaine A05442 (Y: 14 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-08 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A05448 (Y: 11 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-07-08 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 219 PN 188, Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-13 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-09 - House - House Floor: SB 219 PN 188, MOTION TO TABLE AMENDMENTS (Y: 102 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-07-08 - House - House Finance: Motion that amendment A05442 not Germaine A05442 (Y: 14 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-08 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A05448 (Y: 11 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-07-08 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 219 PN 188, Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-13 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-11 | House | Act No. 53 of 2024 |
2024-07-11 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2024-07-10 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2024-07-10 | House | Signed in House |
2024-07-10 | House | Signed in Senate |
2024-07-10 | House | Third consideration and final passage (102-100) |
2024-07-10 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2024-07-09 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2024-07-09 | House | Second consideration |
2024-07-08 | House | Removed from table |
2024-07-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2024-07-08 | House | First consideration |
2024-07-08 | House | Reported as committed |
2024-07-03 | House | Referred to FINANCE |
2024-07-03 | House | In the House |
2024-07-03 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (46-4) |
2024-07-02 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2024-06-24 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2024-06-24 | Senate | Second consideration |
2024-06-11 | Senate | Removed from table |
2024-06-11 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Removed from table |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2023-12-13 | Senate | First consideration |
2023-12-13 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |