PA SB153 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on November 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-03 - Act No. 145 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on November 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-03 - Act No. 145 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in size, weight and load, further providing for maximum gross weight of vehicles.
Title
In size, weight and load, further providing for maximum gross weight of vehicles.
Sponsors
Sen. Wayne Langerholc [R] | Sen. David Argall [R] | Sen. Elder Vogel [R] | Sen. Robert Mensch [R] |
Sen. Patrick Stefano [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-10-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-26 - House - House Floor: SB 153 PN 127, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 172 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 153 PN 127, Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-26 - House - House Floor: SB 153 PN 127, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 172 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 153 PN 127, Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-03 | House | Act No. 145 of 2022 |
2022-11-03 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2022-10-27 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2022-10-26 | House | Signed in House |
2022-10-26 | House | Signed in Senate |
2022-10-26 | House | Third consideration and final passage (172-27) |
2022-10-26 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-10-25 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-10-25 | House | Second consideration |
2022-06-30 | House | Removed from table |
2022-05-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-05-24 | House | Removed from table |
2022-01-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-01-25 | House | First consideration |
2022-01-25 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-09-28 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2021-09-27 | House | In the House |
2021-09-27 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-1) |
2021-09-21 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-06-22 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |