PA SB1510 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-23 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-23 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Pennsylvania Historical and Museum Commission and the Governor, to grant and convey to the Erie Art Museum, certain lands situate in the City of Erie, Erie County.
Title
Authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Pennsylvania Historical and Museum Commission and the Governor, to grant and convey to the Erie Art Museum, certain lands situate in the City of Erie, Erie County.
Sponsors
Sen. Jane Earll [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-21 - Senate - SB 1510 PN 2151, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-08 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-08 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-23 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2012-05-21 | House | In the House |
2012-05-21 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (47-0) |
2012-05-09 | Senate | Second consideration |
2012-05-08 | Senate | First consideration |
2012-05-08 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2012-05-02 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |