PA SB1456 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on August 24 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-10-14 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 24 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-10-14 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, further providing for Pennsylvania State Police.
Title
Further providing for Pennsylvania State Police.
Sponsors
Sen. Wayne Fontana [D] | Sen. Richard Kasunic [D] | Sen. Michael O'Pake [D] | Sen. Mike Stack [D] |
Sen. Christine Tartaglione [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-10-14 | Laid on the table | |
2010-10-12 | First consideration | |
2010-10-12 | Reported as committed | |
2010-08-24 | Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE |