PA SB1382 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-01 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-01 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act designating an interchange at the intersection of Routes 136 and I-70, Washington County, as the Officer John David Dryer Memorial Interchange.
Title
Designating an interchange at the intersection of Routes 136 and I-70, Washington County, as the Officer John David Dryer Memorial Interchange.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-08 - Senate - SB 1382 PN 1891, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-01 | House | Laid on the table |
2012-10-01 | House | Removed from table |
2012-06-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2012-06-19 | House | First consideration |
2012-06-19 | House | Reported as committed |
2012-05-10 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2012-05-08 | House | In the House |
2012-05-08 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (47-0) |
2012-05-07 | Senate | Second consideration |
2012-03-26 | Senate | Removed from table |
2012-03-26 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2012-01-25 | Senate | First consideration |
2012-01-25 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2012-01-13 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |