PA SB1307 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.343, No.176), known as The Fiscal Code, in emergency COVID-19 response, providing for appropriations from the account, for Pennsylvania Infrastructure Investment Authority, for Low-Income Energy Assistance Residential Utility Payment Program and for the Pennsylvania Public Utility Commission.
Title
In emergency COVID-19 response, providing for appropriations from the account, for Pennsylvania Infrastructure Investment Authority, for Low-Income Energy Assistance Residential Utility Payment Program and for the Pennsylvania Public Utility Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-19 | Senate | Removed from table |
2020-11-19 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2020-11-18 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-09-09 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2020-09-08 | Senate | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |