PA SB1307 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-10-14 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-10-14 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, providing for governing body of the Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency; and making a related repeal.
Title
Providing for governing body of the Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency; and making a related repeal.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-10-14 | Laid on the table | |
2010-09-21 | First consideration | |
2010-09-21 | Reported as committed | |
2010-04-08 | Referred to EDUCATION |