PA SB1303 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 3 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-15 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 3 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-15 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, further providing for distress in school districts of the first class.
Title
Further providing for distress in school districts of the first class.
Sponsors
Sen. Vincent Hughes [D] | Sen. Shirley Kitchen [D] | Sen. Mike Stack [D] | Sen. Christine Tartaglione [D] |
Sen. Leanna Washington [D] | Sen. Anthony Williams [D] | Sen. Lawrence Farnese [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-10-03 - Senate - SB 1303 PN 2450, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-18 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-18 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-15 | House | Removed from table |
2012-10-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2012-10-15 | House | First consideration |
2012-10-15 | House | Reported as committed |
2012-10-04 | House | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS |
2012-10-03 | House | In the House |
2012-10-03 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (43-5) |
2012-10-02 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2012-10-01 | Senate | Removed from table |
2012-06-30 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2012-06-18 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2012-06-13 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2012-06-12 | Senate | Second consideration |
2012-06-05 | Senate | Removed from table |
2012-06-05 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2012-05-01 | Senate | First consideration |
2012-05-01 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2011-10-26 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |