PA SB1175 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-25 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-25 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 18 (Crimes and Offenses) and 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in wiretapping and electronic surveillance, further providing for administrative subpoena; and, in juvenile matters, further providing for powers and duties of probation officers and for detention of child.
Title
In wiretapping and electronic surveillance, further providing for administrative subpoena; and, in juvenile matters, further providing for powers and duties of probation officers and for detention of child.
Sponsors
Sen. Kim Ward [R] | Sen. John Rafferty [R] | Sen. Randy Vulakovich [R] | Sen. Jay Costa [D] |
Sen. Guy Reschenthaler [R] | Sen. Camera Bartolotta [R] | Sen. Patrick Stefano [R] | Sen. Patrick Browne [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-09-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-25 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2018-09-24 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-06-05 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-06-05 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |