PA SB1147 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-30 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: House Labor And Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-30 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: House Labor And Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 5, 2012 (P.L.1086, No.127), known as the Public Works Employment Verification Act, further providing for verification form and for enforcement and sanctions; and establishing the Public Works Employment Verification Account.
Title
Further providing for verification form and for enforcement and sanctions; and establishing the Public Works Employment Verification Account.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1147 PN 1673, Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A04190 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A04190 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | House | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |
2022-06-29 | House | In the House |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (44-6) |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-05-24 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |