PA SB1129 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-26 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-26 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 23 (Domestic Relations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in adoption, further providing for definitions, for hearing, for grounds for involuntary termination and for petition for involuntary termination, providing for notice if identity or whereabouts of birth parent or putative father unknown, further providing for consents necessary to adoption and repealing provisions relating to consents not naming adopting parents.
Title
In adoption, further providing for definitions, for hearing, for grounds for involuntary termination and for petition for involuntary termination, providing for notice if identity or whereabouts of birth parent or putative father unknown, further providing for consents necessary to adoption and repealing provisions relating to consents not naming adopting parents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-09-26 - House - House Children And Youth: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-26 - House - House Children And Youth: Adopt Amendment A09217 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-26 - House - House Children And Youth: Adopt Amendment A09236 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - House - House Judiciary: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1129 PN 1822, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-26 - House - House Children And Youth: Adopt Amendment A09217 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-26 - House - House Children And Youth: Adopt Amendment A09236 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - House - House Judiciary: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1129 PN 1822, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-09-26 | House | First consideration |
2018-09-26 | House | Reported as amended |
2018-09-25 | House | Re-referred to CHILDREN AND YOUTH |
2018-09-25 | House | Reported with request to re-refer to CHILDREN AND YOUTH |
2018-06-13 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2018-06-11 | House | In the House |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-06-05 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-06-05 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |