PA SB1112 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-21 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-21 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act making appropriations from the Philadelphia Taxicab and Limousine Regulatory Fund and the Philadelphia Taxicab Medallion Fund to the Philadelphia Parking Authority for the fiscal year July 1, 2022, to June 30, 2023.
Title
Making appropriations from the Philadelphia Taxicab and Limousine Regulatory Fund and the Philadelphia Taxicab Medallion Fund to the Philadelphia Parking Authority for the fiscal year July 1, 2022, to June 30, 2023.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-15 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1112 PN 1725, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A04396 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1112 PN 1725, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A04396 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-21 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-21 | House | Second consideration |
2022-06-20 | House | Removed from table |
2022-06-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-06-15 | House | First consideration |
2022-06-15 | House | Reported as committed |
2022-06-08 | House | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-08 | House | In the House |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2022-06-07 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-04-12 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |