PA SB1106 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-21 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-21 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act making appropriations from the Professional Licensure Augmentation Account and from restricted revenue accounts within the General Fund to the Department of State for use by the Bureau of Professional and Occupational Affairs in support of the professional licensure boards assigned thereto.
Title
Making appropriations from the Professional Licensure Augmentation Account and from restricted revenue accounts within the General Fund to the Department of State for use by the Bureau of Professional and Occupational Affairs in support of the professional licensure boards assigned thereto.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-15 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1106 PN 1720, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A04397 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1106 PN 1720, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A04397 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-21 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-21 | House | Second consideration |
2022-06-20 | House | Removed from table |
2022-06-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-06-15 | House | First consideration |
2022-06-15 | House | Reported as committed |
2022-06-08 | House | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-08 | House | In the House |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2022-06-07 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-04-12 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |