PA SB1100 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-08 - Act No. 1A of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-08 - Act No. 1A of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to provide appropriations from the General Fund for the expenses of the Executive, Legislative and Judicial Departments of the Commonwealth, the public debt and the public schools for the fiscal year July 1, 2022, to June 30, 2023, and for the payment of bills incurred and remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2022; to provide appropriations from special funds and accounts to the Executive and Judicial Departments for the fiscal year July 1, 2022, to June 30, 2023, and for the payment of bills remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2022; to provide for the appropriation of Federal funds to the Executive and Judicial Departments for the fiscal year July 1, 2022, to June 30, 2023, and for the payment of bills remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2022; and to provide for the additional appropriation of Federal and State funds to the Executive and Legislative Departments for the fiscal year July 1, 2021, to June 30, 2022, and for the payment of bills incurred and remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2021.
Title
To provide appropriations from the General Fund for the expenses of the Executive, Legislative and Judicial Departments of the Commonwealth, the public debt and the public schools for the fiscal year July 1, 2022, to June 30, 2023, and for the payment of bills incurred and remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2022; to provide appropriations from special funds and accounts to the Executive and Judicial Departments for the fiscal year July 1, 2022, to June 30, 2023, and for the payment of bills remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2022; to provide for the appropriation of Federal funds to the Executive and Judicial Departments for the fiscal year July 1, 2022, to June 30, 2023, and for the payment of bills remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2022; and to provide for the additional appropriation of Federal and State funds to the Executive and Legislative Departments for the fiscal year July 1, 2021, to June 30, 2022, and for the payment of bills incurred and remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-07-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1100 PN 1852, Concur in House Amendments (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-07 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-07 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A05368 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-07 - House - House Floor: SB 1100 PN 1852, FP (Y: 180 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-07-07 - House - House Floor: PROCEED WITH BILLS BENNINGHOFF, SB 1100,1222, HB 1642 (Y: 186 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - House - House Floor: SB 1100 PN 1436, MOVE PREV QUESTION, SAYLOR (Y: 111 N: 89 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1100 PN 1436, Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-07 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-07 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A05368 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-07 - House - House Floor: SB 1100 PN 1852, FP (Y: 180 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-07-07 - House - House Floor: PROCEED WITH BILLS BENNINGHOFF, SB 1100,1222, HB 1642 (Y: 186 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - House - House Floor: SB 1100 PN 1436, MOVE PREV QUESTION, SAYLOR (Y: 111 N: 89 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1100 PN 1436, Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-08 | Senate | Act No. 1A of 2022 |
2022-07-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2022-07-08 | Senate | Signed in House |
2022-07-08 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2022-07-08 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (47-3) |
2022-07-07 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2022-07-07 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2022-07-07 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-07-07 | House | Third consideration and final passage (180-20) |
2022-07-07 | House | Re-reported as amended |
2022-06-20 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-20 | House | Second consideration |
2022-06-15 | House | Removed from table |
2022-06-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-06-15 | House | First consideration |
2022-06-15 | House | Reported as committed |
2022-06-15 | House | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-14 | House | In the House |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-1) |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-04-12 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |