PA SB1075 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on October 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-08 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-08 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 18 (Crimes and Offenses), 23 (Domestic Relations) and 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in minors, further providing for the offense of sexual abuse of children; in child protective services, providing for task force on child pornography; and, in sentencing, further providing for sentencing for offenses involving sexual abuse of children.
Title
In minors, further providing for the offense of sexual abuse of children; in child protective services, providing for task force on child pornography; and, in sentencing, further providing for sentencing for offenses involving sexual abuse of children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-06 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1075 PN 2067, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-08 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2020-10-06 | House | In the House |
2020-10-06 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2020-10-05 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-09-21 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-09-21 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2020-04-13 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |