PA SB1054 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 8 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-10 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 8 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-10 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Governor, to grant and convey to ACMIII, LP, certain lands of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania situate in Derry Township, Westmoreland County.
Title
Authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Governor, to grant and convey to ACMIII, LP, certain lands of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania situate in Derry Township, Westmoreland County.
Sponsors
Sen. Kim Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-12-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1054 PN 1391, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-10 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2015-12-08 | House | In the House |
2015-12-08 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2015-12-05 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-11-17 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-11-17 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-11-10 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |