PA SB105 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-7)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-03 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-03 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act providing for the establishment of a searchable budget database-driven Internet website detailing certain information concerning State expenditures.
Title
Providing for the establishment of a searchable budget database-driven Internet website detailing certain information concerning State expenditures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-06-01 - Senate - SB 105 PN 1005, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-03 | Referred to FINANCE | |
2009-06-01 | In the House | |
2009-06-01 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-05-06 | Amended on third consideration | |
2009-05-05 | Second consideration | |
2009-05-04 | Amended on second consideration | |
2009-04-20 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-02-11 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-02-10 | First consideration | |
2009-02-10 | Reported as committed | |
2009-02-06 | Referred to FINANCE |