PA SB1041 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-26 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: House Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-26 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: House Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 51 (Military Affairs) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in veteran-owned small businesses, further providing for definitions, repealing provisions relating to definitions, further providing for exemption and providing for veteran-owned business logotype.
Title
In veteran-owned small businesses, further providing for definitions, repealing provisions relating to definitions, further providing for exemption and providing for veteran-owned business logotype.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1041 PN 1683, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2018-04-24 | House | In the House |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-03-20 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |