PA SB1021 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-04-03 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-04-03 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, repealing provisions relating to pool and billiard rooms.
Title
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, repealing provisions relating to pool and billiard rooms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-03 | Referred to JUDICIARY | |
2008-04-02 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2008-04-01 | Second consideration | |
2008-03-18 | First consideration | |
2008-03-18 | Reported as committed | |
2007-07-03 | Referred to JUDICIARY |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=1021 |