PA HR94 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 43-26)
Status: Passed on April 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-04 - Adopted (196-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 43-26)
Status: Passed on April 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-04 - Adopted (196-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution recognizing the month of April 2011 as "Autism Awareness Month" and April 2, 2011, as "World Autism Day" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Recognizing the month of April 2011 as "Autism Awareness Month" and April 2, 2011, as "World Autism Day" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-04 - House - UNCONTESTED CALENDAR (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - House - UNCONTESTED CALENDAR (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - House - UNCONTESTED CALENDAR (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-04 | House | Adopted (196-0) |
2011-02-28 | House | INTRODUCED AS NONCONTROVERSIAL RESOLUTION UNDER RULE 35 |