PA HR912 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-6)
Status: Passed on October 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - Adopted (200-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-6)
Status: Passed on October 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - Adopted (200-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution recognizing November 19, 2020, as "The Great American Smokeout Day" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Recognizing November 19, 2020, as "The Great American Smokeout Day" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-21 - House - House Floor: HR 912 PN 3996 (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-09-02 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-02 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-21 | House | Adopted (200-0) |
2020-09-02 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-06-23 | House | Referred to HEALTH |