PA HR653 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-3)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-09-29 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-09-29 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution petitioning the Congress of the United States to call a convention to amend the Constitution of the United States on the subject of election spending.
Title
A Concurrent Resolution petitioning the Congress of the United States to call a convention to amend the Constitution of the United States on the subject of election spending.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-29 | Removed from table | |
2010-09-29 | Laid on the table | |
2010-06-25 | Removed from table | |
2010-06-25 | Laid on the table | |
2010-05-04 | Reported as committed | |
2010-03-09 | Referred to INTERGOVERNMENTAL AFFAIRS |