PA HR571 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-29 - Adopted (198-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-29 - Adopted (198-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution designating October 28, 2019, as "Steve Blass Day" in Pennsylvania to celebrate the Pittsburgh Pirates icon.
Title
Designating October 28, 2019, as "Steve Blass Day" in Pennsylvania to celebrate the Pittsburgh Pirates icon.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-29 - House - House Floor: HR 571 PN 2713 (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - House - House Tourism And Recreational Development: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - House - House Tourism And Recreational Development: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-29 | House | Adopted (198-0) |
2019-10-21 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-10-18 | House | Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 2713 |
2019-10-18 | House | Referred to TOURISM AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT |