PA HR51 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Adopted (201-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Adopted (201-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution honoring Jacobus Franciscus "Jim" Thorpe by designating May 28, 2023, as "Jim Thorpe Day" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Honoring Jacobus Franciscus "Jim" Thorpe by designating May 28, 2023, as "Jim Thorpe Day" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-24 - House - House Floor: HR 51 PN 741 (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - House Tourism And Economic And Recreational Development: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - House Tourism And Economic And Recreational Development: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-24 | House | Adopted (201-0) |
2023-05-03 | House | Reported as committed |
2023-03-30 | House | Referred to TOURISM AND ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT |