PA HR505 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-9)
Status: Passed on October 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-29 - Adopted (198-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-9)
Status: Passed on October 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-29 - Adopted (198-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution designating November 12, 2019, the 550th anniversary of the birth of Guru Nanak, the founder of Sikhism, as "World Equality Day" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Designating November 12, 2019, the 550th anniversary of the birth of Guru Nanak, the founder of Sikhism, as "World Equality Day" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-29 - House - House Floor: HR 505 PN 2515 (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-10-23 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-23 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-29 | House | Adopted (198-0) |
2019-10-23 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-09-19 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |