PA HR462 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 29-5)
Status: Introduced on October 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-16 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-16 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution honoring the life and legacy of Mr. Joseph Anthony Vento and extending condolences to his family and friends.
Title
Honoring the life and legacy of Mr. Joseph Anthony Vento and extending condolences to his family and friends.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-16 | House | Removed from table |
2012-10-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2012-06-25 | House | Removed from table |
2012-06-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2012-05-23 | House | Reported as committed |
2011-11-01 | House | Referred to RULES |
2011-10-19 | House | INTRODUCED AS NONCONTROVERSIAL RESOLUTION UNDER RULE 35 |