PA HR429 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-12)
Status: Introduced on August 15 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-10-09 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A Resolution establishing a legislative task force on the delivery of high-speed broadband services and directing the Joint State Government Commission to establish an advisory committee to conduct a study on the delivery of high-speed broadband services in unserved areas and underserved areas of this Commonwealth and to report its findings and recommendations to the House of Representatives.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a legislative task force on the delivery of high-speed broadband services and directing the Joint State Government Commission to establish an advisory committee to conduct a study on the delivery of high-speed broadband services in unserved areas and underserved areas of this Commonwealth and to report its findings and recommendations to the House of Representatives.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-10 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A06337 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-09HouseRemoved from table
2018-10-09HouseLaid on the table
2018-06-12HouseRemoved from table
2018-06-12HouseLaid on the table
2018-04-10HouseReported as amended
2017-08-15HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback