PA HR106 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Signed in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A Concurrent Resolution terminating the March 6, 2020, proclamation of disaster emergency, as amended and renewed, issued under the hand and seal of the Governor, Thomas Westerman Wolf.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A Concurrent Resolution terminating the March 6, 2020, proclamation of disaster emergency, as amended and renewed, issued under the hand and seal of the Governor, Thomas Westerman Wolf.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-10 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: HR 106 PN 1753 (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: HR 106 PN 1751, 2021 A15840, WARD, K. Amendment No. A-1584 (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - House - House Floor: HR 106 PN 1753 (Y: 121 N: 81 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Amended (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House Floor: HR 106 PN 1736 (Y: 113 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House Floor: HR 106 PN 1597, 2021 A1183, DIAMOND (Y: 113 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House Floor: HR 106 PN 1597, 2021 A1155, BENNINGHOFF (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House State Government: To Table (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-10HouseSigned in Senate
2021-06-10HouseSigned in House
2021-06-10HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (121-81)
2021-06-10HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2021-06-10HouseReferred to RULES
2021-06-10HouseIn the House
2021-06-10SenateAdopted (30-20)
2021-06-09SenateAmended, June 10, 2021 (30 - 20)
2021-06-09SenateReported as amended
2021-06-09SenateReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
2021-06-09SenateIn the Senate
2021-06-09HouseCorrective Reprint, Printer's No. 1737
2021-06-08HouseAmended and Adopted (113-90)
2021-05-25HouseReported as committed
2021-05-24HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=R&bn=106
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=R&billNbr=0106&pn=1597
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=R&billNbr=0106&pn=1736
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=R&billNbr=0106&pn=1737
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=R&billNbr=0106&pn=1751
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=R&billNbr=0106&pn=1753
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=05/25/2021&RollCallId=464
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=05/25/2021&RollCallId=465
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=301
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=302
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=303
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=21&theDate=06/09/2021&RollCallId=288
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=322
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=148
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=150
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/10/2021&RollCallId=599

Bill Comments 750

feedback