PA HB986 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - Act No. 23
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - Act No. 23
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of August 26, 1971 (P.L.351, No.91), known as the State Lottery Law, further providing for powers and duties of secretary; and providing for reports.
Title
Further providing for powers and duties of secretary; and providing for reports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-24 - House - HB 986 PN 1849, CONCUR (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-06-23 - Senate - HB 986 PN 1849, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-20 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - House - HB 986 PN 1067, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-06-23 - Senate - HB 986 PN 1849, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-20 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - House - HB 986 PN 1067, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-30 | House | Act No. 23 |
2011-06-30 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2011-06-27 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2011-06-26 | House | Signed in Senate |
2011-06-24 | House | Signed in House |
2011-06-24 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (195-0) |
2011-06-24 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2011-06-23 | House | Referred to RULES |
2011-06-23 | House | In the House |
2011-06-23 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2011-06-21 | Senate | Second consideration |
2011-06-20 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2011-06-08 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-05-10 | Senate | First consideration |
2011-05-10 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2011-04-25 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |
2011-04-13 | Senate | In the Senate |
2011-04-13 | House | Third consideration and final passage (197-0) |
2011-04-11 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2011-04-06 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-04-06 | House | Second consideration |
2011-04-05 | House | Removed from table |
2011-04-04 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-04-04 | House | First consideration |
2011-04-04 | House | Reported as committed |
2011-03-09 | House | Referred to FINANCE |