PA HB944 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-12)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Act No. 41
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, in powers and duties of the Department of Drug and Alcohol Programs, further providing for powers and duties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In powers and duties of the Department of Drug and Alcohol Programs, further providing for powers and duties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-25 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 944 PN 1865, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - House - House Floor: HB 944 PN 1865, CONCUR (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - House Floor: HB 944 PN 951, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-30HouseAct No. 41
2021-06-30HouseApproved by the Governor
2021-06-28HousePresented to the Governor
2021-06-25HouseSigned in Senate
2021-06-25HouseSigned in House
2021-06-25HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (201-0)
2021-06-25HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2021-06-25HouseReferred to RULES
2021-06-25HouseIn the House
2021-06-25SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2021-06-22SenateRe-reported as committed
2021-06-22SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-06-22SenateSecond consideration
2021-06-21SenateFirst consideration
2021-06-21SenateReported as amended
2021-04-21SenateReferred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
2021-04-20SenateIn the Senate
2021-04-20HouseThird consideration and final passage (201-0)
2021-04-20HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-04-19HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-04-19HouseSecond consideration
2021-04-07HouseRemoved from table
2021-04-06HouseLaid on the table
2021-04-06HouseFirst consideration
2021-04-06HouseReported as committed
2021-03-17HouseReferred to HUMAN SERVICES

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=944
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0944&pn=0951
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0944&pn=1865
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0944P0951.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/SFN/2021/0/HB0944P1865.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0944P1865.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=56&theDate=04/06/2021&RollCallId=274
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/20/2021&RollCallId=325
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=162
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=33&theDate=06/21/2021&RollCallId=360
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/22/2021&RollCallId=407
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=458
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=242
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/25/2021&RollCallId=788

Bill Comments

feedback