PA HB908 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-1)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-09-26 - Re-committed to RULES
Status: Introduced on March 22 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-09-26 - Re-committed to RULES
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, further providing for school lunch and breakfast reimbursement and for duties of Department of Education.
Title
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, further providing for school lunch and breakfast reimbursement and for duties of Department of Education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-09-26 | Re-committed to RULES | |
2007-09-26 | Removed from table | |
2007-09-26 | Laid on the table | |
2007-07-06 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-06-20 | Re-committed to RULES | |
2007-06-20 | First consideration | |
2007-06-20 | Reported as committed | |
2007-03-22 | Referred to EDUCATION |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=908 |