PA HB889 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-10 - Act No. 22 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-10 - Act No. 22 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 22, 1951 (P.L.317, No.69), known as The Professional Nursing Law, further providing for examinations and certificates.
Title
Further providing for examinations and certificates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 889 PN 880, Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-26 - House - House Floor: HB 889 PN 880, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-10-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-04 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-26 - House - House Floor: HB 889 PN 880, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-10-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-04 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-10 | Senate | Act No. 22 of 2022 |
2022-06-10 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2022-06-07 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Signed in House |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (47-0) |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Removed from table |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-01-25 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2021-10-26 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-10-26 | House | Third consideration and final passage (198-0) |
2021-10-26 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-10-25 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-10-25 | House | Second consideration |
2021-10-06 | House | Removed from table |
2021-10-04 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-10-04 | House | First consideration |
2021-10-04 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |