PA HB877 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-06-07 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Human Services Code, in fiscal provisions relating to public assistance, providing for distribution of SNAP benefits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In fiscal provisions relating to public assistance, providing for distribution of SNAP benefits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-07 - House - House Floor: HB 877 PN 1697, 2017 A1727, SUSP RULES, DAWKINS (Y: 78 N: 116 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2017-06-07 - House - House Floor: HB 877 PN 1697, 2017 A1326, GAINEY (Y: 80 N: 114 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2017-06-07 - House - House Floor: HB 877 PN 1697, 2017 A1325, GAINEY (Y: 78 N: 116 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2017-06-07 - House - House Floor: HB 877 PN 1697, 2017 A1324, GAINEY (Y: 84 N: 110 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2017-06-07 - House - House Floor: HB 877 PN 1697, 2017 A1586, TOOHIL (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House Health: To Table (Y: 0 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-09 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A01169 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-07HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-06-07HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2017-05-22HouseRemoved from table
2017-05-09HouseLaid on the table
2017-05-09HouseFirst consideration
2017-05-09HouseReported as amended
2017-03-16HouseReferred to HEALTH

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=877
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0877&pn=0980
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0877&pn=1697
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0877&pn=1943
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=05/09/2017&RollCallId=361
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=05/09/2017&RollCallId=363
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=05/09/2017&RollCallId=362
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=432
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=433
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=434
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=435
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=436

Bill Comments

feedback