PA HB862 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 29 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Third consideration and final passage (202-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act authorizing the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania to join the Physical Therapy Licensure Compact; and providing for the form of the compact.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania to join the Physical Therapy Licensure Compact; and providing for the form of the compact.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-29 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-29 - House - House Floor: HB 862 PN 976, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-15 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-29HouseThird consideration and final passage (202-0)
2020-09-29HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-09-17HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-09-17HouseSecond consideration
2020-09-16HouseRemoved from table
2020-09-15HouseLaid on the table
2020-09-15HouseFirst consideration
2020-09-15HouseReported as committed
2019-03-18HouseReferred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback