PA HB808 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-08 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-08 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 2, 1915 (P.L.736, No.338), known as the Workers' Compensation Act, in liability and compensation, further providing for the schedule of compensation.
Title
In liability and compensation, further providing for the schedule of compensation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-05-11 | House | Removed from table |
2011-05-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-05-10 | House | First consideration |
2011-05-10 | House | Reported as amended |
2011-02-24 | House | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |