PA HB80 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-6)
Status: Passed on November 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-06 - Act No. 192
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-6)
Status: Passed on November 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-06 - Act No. 192
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in burglary and other criminal intrusion, further providing for the offense of criminal trespass; defining the offense of theft of secondary metal; prescribing penalties; and, in firearms and other dangerous articles, further providing for Pennsylvania State Police and for limitation on the regulation of firearms and ammunition.
Title
In burglary and other criminal intrusion, further providing for the offense of criminal trespass; defining the offense of theft of secondary metal; prescribing penalties; and, in firearms and other dangerous articles, further providing for Pennsylvania State Police and for limitation on the regulation of firearms and ammunition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-24 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - House - HB 80 PN 2066, FP (Y: 197 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - House - HB 80 PN 2066, 2013 A2533, SUSP RULES, DAVIS (Y: 92 N: 105 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2013-06-24 - House - HB 80 PN 2066, 2013 A2450, DAVIS (Y: 94 N: 103 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2013-06-24 - House - HB 80 PN 2066, 2013 A2330, NEUMAN (Y: 93 N: 104 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2013-06-25 - House - HB 80 PN 2066, FP (Y: 197 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - House - HB 80 PN 2066, 2013 A2533, SUSP RULES, DAVIS (Y: 92 N: 105 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2013-06-24 - House - HB 80 PN 2066, 2013 A2450, DAVIS (Y: 94 N: 103 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2013-06-24 - House - HB 80 PN 2066, 2013 A2330, NEUMAN (Y: 93 N: 104 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-06 | House | Act No. 192 |
2014-11-06 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2014-11-06 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2014-11-06 | House | Signed in Senate |
2014-11-05 | House | Signed in House |
2014-10-20 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (138-56) |
2014-10-20 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2014-10-20 | House | Referred to RULES |
2014-10-16 | House | In the House |
2014-10-16 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (34-14) |
2014-10-15 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2014-10-06 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2014-09-24 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-09-23 | Senate | Removed from table |
2014-06-27 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2014-06-24 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2013-06-28 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2013-06-25 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-06-25 | House | Third consideration and final passage (197-2) |
2013-06-25 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-06-24 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-06-24 | House | Second consideration |
2013-06-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-06-18 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2013-06-18 | House | First consideration |
2013-06-18 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-01-10 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |