PA HB791 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-28 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-28 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act authorizing public school districts to implement senior local tax reduction incentive volunteer exchange programs.
Title
Authorizing public school districts to implement senior local tax reduction incentive volunteer exchange programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-11 - House - House Floor: HB 791 PN 3024, FP (Y: 194 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A06227 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A06227 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |
2016-04-11 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-04-11 | House | Third consideration and final passage (194-1) |
2016-04-06 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-04-05 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-04-05 | House | Second consideration |
2016-04-04 | House | Removed from table |
2016-03-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-03-23 | House | First consideration |
2016-03-23 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-03-13 | House | Referred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES |