PA HB790 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-3)
Status: Passed on October 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-30 - Act No. 46
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-3)
Status: Passed on October 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-30 - Act No. 46
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Amending Title 3 (Agriculture) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, regulating controlled plants and noxious weeds; establishing the Controlled Plant and Noxious Weed Committee; providing for powers and duties of the Controlled Plant and Noxious Weed Committee; imposing powers and duties on the Secretary of Agriculture and municipalities; prescribing penalties; establishing a category of controlled plants and providing for the permitting of controlled plants; abrogating regulations; and making related repeals.
Title
Amending Title 3 (Agriculture) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, regulating controlled plants and noxious weeds; establishing the Controlled Plant and Noxious Weed Committee; providing for powers and duties of the Controlled Plant and Noxious Weed Committee; imposing powers and duties on the Secretary of Agriculture and municipalities; prescribing penalties; establishing a category of controlled plants and providing for the permitting of controlled plants; abrogating regulations; and making related repeals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-10-24 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-24 - House - House Floor: HB 790 PN 2597, CONCUR (Y: 184 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2017-10-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 790 PN 2597, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - House - House Floor: HB 790 PN 1701, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House Floor: HB 790 PN 1570, 2017 A1177, CAUSER (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Adopt Amendment A01014 (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Adopt Amendment A00801 (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-24 - House - House Floor: HB 790 PN 2597, CONCUR (Y: 184 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2017-10-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 790 PN 2597, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - House - House Floor: HB 790 PN 1701, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House Floor: HB 790 PN 1570, 2017 A1177, CAUSER (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Adopt Amendment A01014 (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Adopt Amendment A00801 (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-30 | House | Act No. 46 |
2017-10-30 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2017-10-25 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2017-10-25 | House | Signed in Senate |
2017-10-24 | House | Signed in House |
2017-10-24 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (184-0) |
2017-10-24 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2017-10-18 | House | Referred to RULES |
2017-10-18 | House | In the House |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2017-10-17 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2017-10-16 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2017-07-08 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-07-08 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-06-20 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |
2017-05-22 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-05-22 | House | Third consideration and final passage (194-0) |
2017-05-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-05-09 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-05-09 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2017-05-08 | House | Removed from table |
2017-04-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-04-26 | House | First consideration |
2017-04-26 | House | Reported as amended |
2017-03-10 | House | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |