PA HB731 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-06-12 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Status: Introduced on March 19 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-06-12 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Summary
An Act amending the act of August 10, 1951 (P.L.1189, No.265), entitled, as amended, "An act regulating the appointment, promotion, suspension, reduction, removal and reinstatement of employes (except superintendents, assistant superintendents, inspectors, chief clerks and school guards) in bureaus of police in cities of the second class; and defining the powers and duties of civil service commissions in such cities for such purposes," further providing for qualifications for appointment in the competitive class of the civil service.
Title
An Act amending the act of August 10, 1951 (P.L.1189, No.265), entitled, as amended, "An act regulating the appointment, promotion, suspension, reduction, removal and reinstatement of employes (except superintendents, assistant superintendents, inspectors, chief clerks and school guards) in bureaus of police in cities of the second class; and defining the powers and duties of civil service commissions in such cities for such purposes," further providing for qualifications for appointment in the competitive class of the civil service.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-06-12 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-06-12 | Second consideration | |
2007-06-12 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-06-06 | Re-committed to RULES | |
2007-06-06 | First consideration | |
2007-06-06 | Reported as committed | |
2007-03-19 | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=731 |