PA HB72 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-30 - Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-30 - Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 28, 1937 (P.L.417, No.105), known as the Milk Marketing Law, in licenses of milk dealers, further providing for penalties in lieu of suspension; and, in weighing and testing, further providing for certified testers and for certified weighers and samplers.
Title
In licenses of milk dealers, further providing for penalties in lieu of suspension; and, in weighing and testing, further providing for certified testers and for certified weighers and samplers.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Kerwin [R] | Rep. Barbara Gleim [R] | Rep. Joanne Stehr [R] | Rep. David Zimmerman [R] |
Rep. David Rowe [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-22 - House - House Floor: HB 72 PN 1455, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Adopt Amendment A00705 (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-22 - House - House Floor: HB 72 PN 1455, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Adopt Amendment A00705 (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-30 | Senate | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |
2023-06-22 | Senate | In the Senate |
2023-06-22 | House | Third consideration and final passage (203-0) |
2023-06-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2023-06-21 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-06-21 | House | Second consideration |
2023-06-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2023-06-06 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2023-06-06 | House | First consideration |
2023-06-06 | House | Reported as amended |
2023-03-07 | House | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |