PA HB71 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 57-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-27 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-27 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Joint Resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, in taxation and finance, providing for spending limitations on the Commonwealth.
Title
A Joint Resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, in taxation and finance, providing for spending limitations on the Commonwealth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-21 - House - House Floor: DISCHARGE RES 5, HB 717 (Y: 89 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-04-27 - House - House Floor: HB 71 PN 47, MOT SPECIAL ORDER, BERNSTINE (Y: 82 N: 120 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-04-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-14 - House - House Floor: HB 71 PN 47, 2021 A3225, SUSP RULES (Y: 90 N: 113 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-12-14 - House - House Floor: HB 71 PN 47, 2021 A3220, SUSP RULES (Y: 90 N: 113 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-12-14 - House - House Floor: HB 71 PN 47, 2021 A3218, SUSP RULES (Y: 90 N: 113 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-12-14 - House - House Floor: HB 71 PN 47, 2021 A3216, SUSP RULES (Y: 92 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-01-13 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House Floor: HB 71 PN 47, MOT SPECIAL ORDER, BERNSTINE (Y: 82 N: 120 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-04-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-14 - House - House Floor: HB 71 PN 47, 2021 A3225, SUSP RULES (Y: 90 N: 113 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-12-14 - House - House Floor: HB 71 PN 47, 2021 A3220, SUSP RULES (Y: 90 N: 113 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-12-14 - House - House Floor: HB 71 PN 47, 2021 A3218, SUSP RULES (Y: 90 N: 113 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-12-14 - House - House Floor: HB 71 PN 47, 2021 A3216, SUSP RULES (Y: 92 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-01-13 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-04-13 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-12-14 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-12-14 | House | Second consideration |
2021-11-16 | House | Removed from table |
2021-11-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-09-21 | House | Removed from table |
2021-09-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-05-26 | House | Removed from table |
2021-05-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-03-17 | House | Removed from table |
2021-01-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-01-13 | House | First consideration |
2021-01-13 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-01-11 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |